TN HB1365 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 360
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 360
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the provisions governing a county's, a municipal corporation's, and a special school district's right of subrogation under the local authority's group life, hospitalization, disability, or medical insurance plan. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 27.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 27, relative to local government entities that self-fund a plan of insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 360 | |
2021-04-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee to 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0989 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021