TN HB1365 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from March 15 to March 1, the date by which TSAC must annually report research and data concerning the Tennessee promise scholarship program, including student success and scholarship retention, to the education committees of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, changes, from March 15 to March 1, the date by which TSAC must annually report research and data concerning the Tennessee promise scholarship program, including student success and scholarship retention, to the education committees of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2019-03-26 | House | Ref. to Education |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1229 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee