TN HB1364 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the state, cities, and municipalities from assessing, collecting, or recovering taxes, fees, surcharges, or monetary claims against businesses ordered to cease operations with the public, upon submission of satisfactory proof of a revenue loss resulting from the order. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 50; Title 55 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 50; Title 55 and Title 67, relative to assessment, collection, or recovery of taxes, fees, surcharges, and claims against businesses.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Carter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0990 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee