TN HB1364 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 268
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, rewrites the criminal offense of female genital mutilation; extends the statute of limitations for criminal prosecutions or civil actions for female genital mutilation. - Amends TCA Title 28; Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, rewrites the criminal offense of female genital mutilation; extends the statute of limitations for criminal prosecutions or civil actions for female genital mutilation. - Amends TCA Title 28; Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 268
2019-04-17HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
2019-04-03HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/27/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1166 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 268

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback