TN HB1363 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits use of state funds for registration fees to, and for travel to or from, conferences, symposiums, and workshops beginning May 1, 2017; requires disclosure of travel expenses paid by certain national organizations. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 13 and Title 3, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, prohibits use of state funds for registration fees to, and for travel to or from, conferences, symposiums, and workshops beginning May 1, 2017; requires disclosure of travel expenses paid by certain national organizations. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 13 and Title 3, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Bo Mitchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Next Calendar |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Next Calendar |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2017-04-12 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1373 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-11 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0