TN HB1362 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, waives fee to renew commercial driver license if the license expires prior to the applicant taking the required examination and if such failure to timely take the examination results from a delay by the department or driver license station. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50.
Title
As introduced, waives fee to renew commercial driver license if the license expires prior to the applicant taking the required examination and if such failure to timely take the examination results from a delay by the department or driver license station. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50.
Sponsors
Rep. Bo Mitchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2018-01-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 1/10/2018 |
2017-03-29 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 2018 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1103 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee