TN HB1361 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises escort and permit requirements for certain over-dimension movements. - Amends TCA Title 13; Title 45; Title 47; Title 55; Title 62; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises escort and permit requirements for certain over-dimension movements. - Amends TCA Title 13; Title 45; Title 47; Title 55; Title 62; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09 Pub. Ch. 252
2019-05-09 Effective date(s) 05/02/2019
2019-05-02 Signed by Governor.
2019-04-25HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-04-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-23HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-18HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-17SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2019-04-17SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0238)
2019-04-17SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-10HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-10HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 4, PNV 2
2019-04-10HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0226)
2019-04-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19HouseAction Def. in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-13HouseAssigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
2019-03-13HouseRef. to Transportation Committee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0376 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 252

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback