TN HB1360 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires the commissioner of health, by January 1, 2020, to: study instances when co-prescribing of naloxone with an opioid is beneficial and publish the results to each prescribing board that licenses healthcare professionals who can legally prescribe controlled substances and the board of pharmacy; and include the findings in the treatment guidelines for prescribing opioids. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires the commissioner of health, by January 1, 2020, to: study instances when co-prescribing of naloxone with an opioid is beneficial and publish the results to each prescribing board that licenses healthcare professionals who can legally prescribe controlled substances and the board of pharmacy; and include the findings in the treatment guidelines for prescribing opioids. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Pub. Ch. 327
2019-05-15 Effective date(s) 05/08/2019
2019-05-08 Signed by Governor.
2019-04-29HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-04-25SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-24HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-24HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-22SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-04-22SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0303)
2019-04-22SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-22SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-18HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-18HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 1, PNV 0
2019-04-18HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0388)
2019-04-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019
2019-04-16HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-16HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/16/2019
2019-04-10HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HouseAction Def. in s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee to 4/10/2019
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1384 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 327

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback