TN HB1360 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the commissioner of health, by January 1, 2020, to: study instances when co-prescribing of naloxone with an opioid is beneficial and publish the results to each prescribing board that licenses healthcare professionals who can legally prescribe controlled substances and the board of pharmacy; and include the findings in the treatment guidelines for prescribing opioids. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, requires the commissioner of health, by January 1, 2020, to: study instances when co-prescribing of naloxone with an opioid is beneficial and publish the results to each prescribing board that licenses healthcare professionals who can legally prescribe controlled substances and the board of pharmacy; and include the findings in the treatment guidelines for prescribing opioids. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 327 | |
2019-05-15 | Effective date(s) 05/08/2019 | |
2019-05-08 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-24 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0303) |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2019-04-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0388) |
2019-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee to 4/10/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1384 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 327