TN HB1360 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 332
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 332
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires utility districts created by private act to elect, for purposes of the Occupational Safety and Health Act, whether to be treated as private employers or to create their own programs of compliance. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, requires utility districts created by private act to elect, for purposes of the Occupational Safety and Health Act, whether to be treated as private employers or to create their own programs of compliance. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 332 | |
2015-04-13 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1274 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 332
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1360&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1360.pdf |