TN HB1358 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 431
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, directs the department of health to officially request the United States department of health and human services to add newborn screening for metachromatic leukodystrophy to the recommended uniform screening panel. - Amends TCA Title 14; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 14; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to health care.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-24 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 431
2023-04-20HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-04-20HouseComp. SB subst.
2023-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/19/2023
2023-04-18HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2023
2023-03-29HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2023-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/29/2023
2023-03-21HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2023-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/21/2023
2023-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/21/2023
2023-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/14/2023
2023-03-07HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2023-03-07HouseRef. to Health Committee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0698 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2023

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback