TN HB1358 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes a local governmental entity with centralized purchasing authority to increase the threshold, from $25,000 to $50,000, over which public advertisement and sealed competitive bids are required; reduces the number of purchase orders, from three to two, that must be retained by a county after a purchase order or contract is issued or executed. - Amends TCA Section 5-14-111 and Section 12-3-1212.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes a local governmental entity with centralized purchasing authority to increase the threshold, from $25,000 to $50,000, over which public advertisement and sealed competitive bids are required; reduces the number of purchase orders, from three to two, that must be retained by a county after a purchase order or contract is issued or executed. - Amends TCA Section 5-14-111 and Section 12-3-1212.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/5/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Local Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0048 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-25 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback