TN HB1357 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from March 1 to February 15, the date by which the commissioner of health must file the annual report with the health committees of the general assembly regarding the Tennessee Prescription Safety Act of 2016 program with respect to its effect on distribution and abuse of controlled substances, including recommendations for improving control and prevention of diversion of controlled substances in this state. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 50; Title 53; Title 57; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 50; Title 53; Title 57; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to controlled substances.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1254 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee