TN HB1357 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that an application for a property tax freeze be approved if the qualified applicant dies prior to filing the application, but on or after January 1 of the tax year for which the freeze is sought. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-705.
Title
As introduced, requires that an application for a property tax freeze be approved if the qualified applicant dies prior to filing the application, but on or after January 1 of the tax year for which the freeze is sought. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-705.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/16/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Local Government Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-01-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2018-01-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 1/17/2018 |
2017-04-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 1st Calendar of 2018 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0870 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee