TN HB1355 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, adds administrators of elections to the list of county general officers for purposes of determining compensation; requires counties to compensate administrators as general officers; establishes certain minimum hours for election commission offices in counties with certified administrators of elections. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 8, Chapter 24.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, adds administrators of elections to the list of county general officers for purposes of determining compensation; requires counties to compensate administrators as general officers; establishes certain minimum hours for election commission offices in counties with certified administrators of elections. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 8, Chapter 24.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Local Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1356 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback