TN HB1354 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Historic Revitalization Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 11, Part 1; Title 4, Chapter 17; Title 56, Chapter 4; Title 66 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 11, Part 1; Title 4, Chapter 17; Title 56, Chapter 4; Title 66 and Title 67, relative to tax credits for the rehabilitation of historic structures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0678 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee