TN HB1353 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a graduate nurse to engage in the practice of professional nursing without a license for a limited period of time if certain conditions are met. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 63, Chapter 7, Part 1, relative to nursing graduates.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
Rep. John Gillespie [R] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Michael Curcio [R] |
Rep. Clay Doggett [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/04/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 340 | |
2021-05-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 1 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0293) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-15 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 84, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-04-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-15 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0215) |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1267 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 340