TN HB1353 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department of safety to pay from existing budgeted funds a monthly amount to a retired highway patrol officer for the medical care of the retired canine to whom the officer was assigned if the canine is given to the care and custody of the officer upon retirement. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, requires the department of safety to pay from existing budgeted funds a monthly amount to a retired highway patrol officer for the medical care of the retired canine to whom the officer was assigned if the canine is given to the care and custody of the officer upon retirement. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 426 | |
2017-05-09 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-05-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-09 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/22/17 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-17 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1286 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 426