TN HB1352 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration Subcommittee of Education
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires that all school funds collected by a county for capital projects be apportioned among the LEAs in the county in proportion to each LEA on the basis of the weighted full-time equivalent average daily attendance. - Amends TCA Section 49-3-315.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires that all school funds collected by a county for capital projects be apportioned among the LEAs in the county in proportion to each LEA on the basis of the weighted full-time equivalent average daily attendance. - Amends TCA Section 49-3-315.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration Subcommittee of Education
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26HouseMeeting Canceled
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration Subcommittee for 3/26/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Education Administration Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1216 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback