TN HB1351 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Def. to Summer Study in Infrastructure Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Def. to Summer Study in Infrastructure Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates transportation services district consisting of certain counties; authorizes special allocation of surplus state tax revenue within district to eligible counties for transportation services. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, creates transportation services district consisting of certain counties; authorizes special allocation of surplus state tax revenue within district to eligible counties for transportation services. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Infrastructure Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Infrastructure Subcommittee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Infrastructure Subcommittee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Infrastructure Subcommittee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Infrastructure Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1177 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation & Safety Committee