TN HB1348 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Action Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2020
Pending: House Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies that a person seeking expunction of multiple offenses must petition the court in which the most recent conviction occurred; requires the clerk to serve the petition on the district attorney general for that judicial district and any other judicial district in which the person was convicted of an offense sought to be expunged. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, clarifies that a person seeking expunction of multiple offenses must petition the court in which the most recent conviction occurred; requires the clerk to serve the petition on the district attorney general for that judicial district and any other judicial district in which the person was convicted of an offense sought to be expunged. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseAction Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2020
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseReassigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
2019-03-27HouseReturned to the Clerk's Desk.
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseAction Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/27/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0827 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-21 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback