TN HB1346 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 371
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 371
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the definition of "sexual activity" for purposes of offenses related to the sexual exploitation of children to include an intent of sexual arousal or gratification. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to sexual exploitation of children.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 371 | |
2021-04-26 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1227 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021