TN HB1345 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a licensed caterer to provide notice to the alcoholic beverage commission at least two business days, instead of calendar days, before an event at which the licensed caterer has contracted to provide and sell alcoholic beverages on a form developed by the commission. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, Chapter 4, relative to alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Rep. Harold Love [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0771 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee