TN HB1345 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 952
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, directs the Tennessee advisory commission on intergovernmental relations (TACIR) to perform a study of the potential, overall effects of creating a franchise and excise tax credit for shippers with pickups or deliveries originating in, or destined to, Shelby County. - Amends TCA Title 55 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, directs the Tennessee advisory commission on intergovernmental relations (TACIR) to perform a study of the potential, overall effects of creating a franchise and excise tax credit for shippers with pickups or deliveries originating in, or destined to, Shelby County. - Amends TCA Title 55 and Title 67.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18 Pub. Ch. 952
2018-05-18 Effective date(s) 05/15/2018
2018-05-15 Signed by Governor.
2018-05-07HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2018-05-01SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-25HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-25HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2018-04-23SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0, PNV 1
2018-04-23SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA1148)
2018-04-23SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2018-04-18SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2018-04-18HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2018-04-17HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 86, Nays 6, PNV 1
2018-04-17HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1203)
2018-04-17HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-12HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2018
2018-04-11HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018
2018-04-11HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-04-11HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2018
2018-04-11HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-04-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/11/2018
2018-04-09HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/11/2018
2018-04-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018
2018-03-21HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
2018-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018
2018-03-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
2018-03-07HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/14/2018
2018-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
2017-05-08HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-05-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
2017-04-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
2017-04-05HousePlaced behind the budget
2017-03-29HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
2017-02-17HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-02-15HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-02-13HouseP1C.
2017-02-09HouseIntro.
2017-02-09HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1277 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 952

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback