TN HB1344 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 503
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 503
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires TACIR to conduct a comprehensive evaluation of childhood obesity in the state and its short- and long-term effects. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 33; Title 34; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 43; Title 47; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 55; Title 56; Title 62; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 33; Title 34; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 43; Title 47; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 55; Title 56; Title 62; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to childhood health.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 503 | |
2021-05-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to TACIR |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-25 | House | Re-ref. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-02-25 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1323 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021