TN HB1343 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 1/1/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 1/1/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes the penalty for the offense of reckless endangerment as a Class D felony if the victim of the offense is eight years of age or younger. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, establishes the penalty for the offense of reckless endangerment as a Class D felony if the victim of the offense is eight years of age or younger. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 1/1/2016 |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2015 |
2015-03-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-03-25 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2015 |
2015-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1197 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-22 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1343&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1343.pdf |