TN HB1342 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the notice requirements with which a health care facility must comply under certain circumstances in order to preserve an assignment of health insurance benefits to an out-of-network facility-based physician, or from collecting out-of-network charges from an insured. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, revises the notice requirements with which a health care facility must comply under certain circumstances in order to preserve an assignment of health insurance benefits to an out-of-network facility-based physician, or from collecting out-of-network charges from an insured. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 239 | |
2019-05-09 | Effective date(s) 04/30/2019 | |
2019-04-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-17 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0239) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0090) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-11 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-11 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0230) |
2019-04-11 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0067) |
2019-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1120 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 239