TN HB1339 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 454
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 454
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department of education to develop a state plan for computer science in grades K-12. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, requires the department of education to develop a state plan for computer science in grades K-12. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 454 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/22/2019 | |
2019-05-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-15 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-07 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0292) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0387) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0401) |
2019-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Action def. in Education to 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1151 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 454