TN HB1334 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 268
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 268
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the human trafficking advisory council to develop a poster design that brings awareness to human trafficking and provide the completed poster design to the department of tourism for placement of the posters in each of Tennessee's welcome centers for the public to view. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 30; Title 37; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49 and Section 71-1-135.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 30; Title 37; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49 and Section 71-1-135, relative to human trafficking.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 268 | |
2021-04-19 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1132 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-05 - Effective date(s) 04/30/2021