TN HB1332 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Failed in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Failed in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from October 31 to October 1, the date by which the departments of education and health are required to jointly compile an annual report to the governor and the general assembly of self-administered medications and healthcare procedures. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | House | Failed in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2023-03-08 | House | Ref. to Education Administration |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0899 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee