TN HB1330 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c C&FA Subcommittee of Children and Family Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c C&FA Subcommittee of Children and Family Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from January 15 to February 1 annual deadline for district attorneys general to submit to the standing judiciary committees their reports on the progress of child protective teams. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 37 and Title 39, Chapter 15.
Title
As introduced, changes from January 15 to February 1 annual deadline for district attorneys general to submit to the standing judiciary committees their reports on the progress of child protective teams. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 37 and Title 39, Chapter 15.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c C&FA Subcommittee of Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on s/c cal C&FA Subcommittee for 3/29/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of C&FA | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1122 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-23 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1330&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB1330.pdf |