TN HB1328 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, limits operating permit fee for commercial non-motorized vessel outfitters to the amount of the fee imposed on commercial fishermen; authorizes implementation of parking pass system for outfitters; imposes limitation on fees assessed such outfitters. - Amends TCA Title 69, Chapter 9 and Title 70.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, limits operating permit fee for commercial non-motorized vessel outfitters to the amount of the fee imposed on commercial fishermen; authorizes implementation of parking pass system for outfitters; imposes limitation on fees assessed such outfitters. - Amends TCA Title 69, Chapter 9 and Title 70.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-22HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-22HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0381)
2019-04-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-16HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-15HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 4/16/2019
2019-04-09HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2019-04-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 4/9/2019
2019-03-19HouseDef. to First Calendar of 2020
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0665 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-22 - Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/24/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback