TN HB1327 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 377
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 377
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes, in leases entered into between Memphis and business owners holding a restaurant license from the alcoholic beverage commission, the inclusion of provisions where the rent is calculated on gross sales, including gross sales of alcohol, of the business; prohibits a county from denying the issuance or renewal of a beer permit on the basis of a similar lease; provisions also applicable to Knoxville within an easement area granted to the city for commercial recreation and commercial recreation facilities from TVA in the Fort Loudoun Reservoir. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 1; Title 57, Chapter 4 and Title 57, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, authorizes, in leases entered into between Memphis and business owners holding a restaurant license from the alcoholic beverage commission, the inclusion of provisions where the rent is calculated on gross sales, including gross sales of alcohol, of the business; prohibits a county from denying the issuance or renewal of a beer permit on the basis of a similar lease; provisions also applicable to Knoxville within an easement area granted to the city for commercial recreation and commercial recreation facilities from TVA in the Fort Loudoun Reservoir. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 1; Title 57, Chapter 4 and Title 57, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 377 | |
2019-04-30 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0498 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 377