TN HB1327 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-17 - Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires certain drug manufacturers to submit information to the department of health about drug prices; requires the department of commerce and insurance to promulgate rules relating to disclosure of drug formulary prices. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires certain drug manufacturers to submit information to the department of health about drug prices; requires the department of commerce and insurance to promulgate rules relating to disclosure of drug formulary prices. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-17HouseAssigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
2017-02-15HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee-- Health-- Government Operations for Review
2017-02-13HouseP1C.
2017-02-09HouseIntro.
2017-02-09HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1423 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback