TN HB1325 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires prescribers to check the controlled substances database prior to each prescription of one of the controlled substances that triggers a check of the database. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 10, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, requires prescribers to check the controlled substances database prior to each prescription of one of the controlled substances that triggers a check of the database. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 10, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2018-01-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 1/17/2018 |
2017-04-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 1st Calendar of 2018 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1425 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-07 - Refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee