TN HB1324 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 346
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 346
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a county sheriff to create an inmate reentry education program. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, authorizes a county sheriff to create an inmate reentry education program. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Sanderson [R] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] |
Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 346 | |
2019-05-15 | Effective date(s) 05/10/2019 | |
2019-05-10 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-25 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0321) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0432) |
2019-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-09 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-04-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee |
2019-04-01 | House | Ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0904 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 346