TN HB1323 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department of revenue to annually report on the administration of the Uniform Motor Vehicle Records Disclosure Act by February 1 of each year to the chair of the senate transportation and safety committee, the chair of the transportation committee of the house of representatives, and the legislative librarian; requires the department of safety and county clerks' offices to assist the department of revenue in compiling the report. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 25.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 25, relative to the Uniform Motor Vehicle Records Disclosure Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-02HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1430 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback