TN HB1322 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires law enforcement agencies to annually report statistics and policies regarding police canine units to the POST commission; requires the POST commission to develop and implement state guidelines for the training, care, and use of police canine units for law enforcement purposes. - Amends TCA Title 38.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38, relative to police canine units.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-01-26 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Public Service Subcommittee |
2022-01-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 1/26/2022 |
2021-03-31 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2022 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0948 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee