TN HB1322 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Pub. Ch. 489
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Pub. Ch. 489
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, defines "municipality" for purposes of the authorization for a municipality to create the office of administrative hearing officer to hear building and property maintenance code violations to mean any incorporated town or city, or metropolitan form of government; adds "locally adopted zoning codes" to the codes over which administrative hearing officer has jurisdiction. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 54, Part 10.
Title
As enacted, defines "municipality" for purposes of the authorization for a municipality to create the office of administrative hearing officer to hear building and property maintenance code violations to mean any incorporated town or city, or metropolitan form of government; adds "locally adopted zoning codes" to the codes over which administrative hearing officer has jurisdiction. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 54, Part 10.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Pub. Ch. 489 | |
2017-06-14 | Effective date(s) 06/06/2017 | |
2017-06-06 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-05-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-11 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0386) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-05-08 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 81, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-05-05 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0338) |
2017-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to next Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/25/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1136 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 489