TN HB1321 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 210
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 210
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows school bus drivers to use a portable electronic device for navigation of the school bus and for accurately accounting for students at bus pick-up and drop-off locations through use of the device's global positioning system if no hands are used to hold the device or to enter data into the device while the school bus is in motion; the device is mounted on the school bus's windshield, dashboard, or center console area; and the driver views only data related to the navigation of the bus. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49 and Title 55, relative to the use of global positioning systems while operating school buses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 210 | |
2023-04-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-04-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-30 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/3/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2023 |
2023-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/8/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1434 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-04 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023