TN HB1320 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 686
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 686
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Long-Acting Birth Control Information Act." - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Long-Acting Birth Control Information Act." - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: 3 & 4 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 686 | |
2018-04-17 | Effective date(s) 04/09/2018 | |
2018-04-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-03-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-28 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-22 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 3 and 4 Ayes 78, Nays 13 PNV 2 HB1320 |
2018-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-19 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-19 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 24, Nays 3 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 4 - SA0617) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0616) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0565) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0564) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-05-08 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 75, Nays 3, PNV 0 |
2017-05-05 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0559) |
2017-05-05 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0558) |
2017-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Health Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Health Subcommittee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/22/17 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0883 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 686