TN HB1318 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the chief law enforcement officer of a state or local law enforcement agency to establish policies regarding off-duty use of law enforcement vehicles to provide an enhanced security presence at vulnerable locations, which include places of worship, schools, and parks. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the chief law enforcement officer of a state or local law enforcement agency to establish policies regarding off-duty use of law enforcement vehicles to provide an enhanced security presence at vulnerable locations, which include places of worship, schools, and parks. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] |
Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Pub. Ch. 139 | |
2019-04-15 | Effective date(s) 04/09/2019 | |
2019-04-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0022) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-14 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0038) |
2019-03-07 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1337 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 139