TN HB1312 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that photographic evidence of a fatal motor vehicle accident depicting a deceased minor victim at the scene of the accident is confidential and not open for inspection by members of the public; provides that custodial parent or legal guardian of such deceased minor victim may waive confidentiality and allow the minor victim's photograph to be used and obtained in the same manner as other public records. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55, relative to photographs of minors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 304 | |
2021-04-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-03-09 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-03-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1285 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021