TN HB1312 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 390
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 390
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows municipality with a border region retail tourism development district that elects to remove property from the district to include adjacent property with an equal or lesser amount of acreage by resolution of the municipality. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 40.
Title
As enacted, allows municipality with a border region retail tourism development district that elects to remove property from the district to include adjacent property with an equal or lesser amount of acreage by resolution of the municipality. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 40.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 390 | |
2019-04-30 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-29 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/10/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1122 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 390