TN HB1303 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, exempts from jury service, upon request and sufficient proof of age, persons 75 years of age and older who are incapable of providing service due to a mental or physical condition; requires person seeking such exemption to submit a declaration with certain information. - Amends TCA Title 22.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 22, relative to jury service.
Sponsors
Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Rep. Michael Curcio [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. John Gillespie [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 544 | |
2021-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 23, Nays 7 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment #3 withdrawn. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Failed to pass Senate, Ayes 14, Nays 11 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0291) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-13 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 2, PNV 0 |
2021-04-12 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0123) |
2021-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1296 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 544