TN HB1301 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies that a sexual offender whose victim was a minor may not engage in community service or volunteer work that would cause the offender to be in contact with a minor while required to register with the sexual offender registry. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to sexual offenders.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1484 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback