TN HB1300 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department to make the information on its web page accessible for free to any resident in this state. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 54 and Title 55.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 9; Title 54 and Title 55, relative to transportation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-02HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1354 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback