TN HB1297 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes municipalities to create a fund that provides grants for the study of juveniles involved in prostitution and homicides committed by juveniles; requires such study to be conducted at the direction of the chief executive of a municipality. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 54, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 6, Chapter 54, Part 1, relative to municipal powers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-05-05 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2021-05-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1283 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee