TN HB1296 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Failed in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, provides paid family and medical leave for state employees and teachers. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 8 and Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 8 and Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 7, relative to family leave for public employees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31HouseFailed in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/31/2021
2021-03-24HouseAction Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 3/31/2021
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/24/2021
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
2021-02-24HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2021-02-24HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-02-22HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-11HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0548 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback