TN HB1292 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Failed in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Failed in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a court to issue an emergency protection order upon a finding that a person poses an imminent risk of harm to the person or others if allowed to purchase or possess a firearm; authorizes a family member, household member, intimate partner, or law enforcement officer to petition for such an order. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36 and Title 39, relative to emergency protection orders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Failed in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0939 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee